Global Patent Index - EP 0775074 B9

EP 0775074 B9 2002-11-13 - CONTAINER AND CLOSURE WITH IN-TURNED SEAM

Title (en)

CONTAINER AND CLOSURE WITH IN-TURNED SEAM

Title (de)

BEHÄLTER UND VERSCHLUSS MIT NACH INNEN GEFALTENER FALZNAHT

Title (fr)

RECIPIENT ET BOITE A JONCTION PLIEE VERS L'INTERIEUR

Publication

EP 0775074 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 95931556 A

Priority

  • US 9510674 W
  • US 29395094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9606015A1] A metal can (10, 50, 80, 110, 130) is closed by a specially prepared end closure (18, 64, 88, 120, 140). The open end (20) of the container is outwardly folded to define a supporting ledge and a seaming flange for the end closure. The seaming flange is to be folded or rolled inwardly for defining a seaming flange. The end closure is constructed with a frame member (26, 66, 90, 122, 142) defining a dispensing opening and having an end panel (28, 78, 92, 124, 144) which may be peelably removed to dispense the product from the container. Heat may be applied to the seam during the formation thereof or during a subsequent process step.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 6/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 51/38 (2006.01); B21D 51/46 (2006.01); B29C 65/46 (2006.01); B29C 65/64 (2006.01); B65D 6/30 (2006.01); B65D 8/20 (2006.01); B65D 43/00 (2006.01); B65D 77/20 (2006.01); B29L 22/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/2024 (2013.01); B65D 77/2008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9606015 A1 19960229; AT 212311 T 20020215; AU 3493195 A 19960314; AU 709340 B2 19990826; CA 2198232 A1 19960229; CA 2198232 C 20060131; DE 69525161 D1 20020314; DE 69525161 T2 20021002; EP 0775074 A1 19970528; EP 0775074 A4 19971229; EP 0775074 B1 20020123; EP 0775074 B9 20021113; JP 3707560 B2 20051019; JP H10505313 A 19980526; US 5697514 A 19971216

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090823

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090823

2010-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-03-31 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100301

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080903

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080803

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080905

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG;RESIRAIN 1;8125 ZOLLIKERBERG (CH)

2004-10-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-07-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SILGAN CONTAINERS CORPORATION

2004-02-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-01-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SILGAN CONTAINERS CORPORATION

- Free text: POLYSTAR PACKAGING INCORPORATED#2 TESTA PLACE#NORWALK, CT 06854 (US) -TRANSFER TO- SILGAN CONTAINERS CORPORATION#4 LANDMARK SQUARE#STAMFORD, CT 06901 (US)

2004-01-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-05-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-03-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-01-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020823

2002-08-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020823

2002-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2002-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-07-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020423

2002-04-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020423

2002-04-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020423

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69525161 20020314

2002-02-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-23 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-23 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 212311 T 20020215

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-02-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000105

1997-12-29 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19971103

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970320

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE