Global Patent Index - EP 0775080 B1

EP 0775080 B1 2000-03-08 - LOAD HOISTING SYSTEM

Title (en)

LOAD HOISTING SYSTEM

Title (de)

LASTHEBESYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE LEVAGE DE CHARGES

Publication

EP 0775080 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96917428 A

Priority

  • DE 19521066 A
  • EP 9602252 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19521066A1] The invention relates to a load hoisting system with a plurality of co-operating cables suspended from a crane frame, in which at least two cables are allocated to, for example, four load planes forming the sides of a notional right parallelepiped, the resultant forces of which lie in the appropriate load planes and are symmetrically inclined to the vertical in relation to one another, and in which a first end (the drum end) of each cable runs on a drum and the other (free) end is taken to a securing point. In order precisely to position the load, e.g. a container (C), suspended from the hoisting system, the free ends (E) of the cables (S) of each load plane (L) are secured to shared first adjusting mechanism (H, K) which makes an equal and opposite adjustment to said free ends (E) and hence an opposite alteration in the length of the cables (S) to the same extents. This adjustment deflects the cables in the appropriate load plane sideways whenever a tipping movement is prevented, e.g. by the unaltered cable lengths of the two load planes perpendicular thereto.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 13/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19521066 A1 19961212; EP 0775080 A1 19970528; EP 0775080 B1 20000308; JP H10507435 A 19980721; WO 9641763 A1 19961227

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-02-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021201

2003-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-12-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021201

2002-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010531

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010530

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010530

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010529

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010522

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604595 20000413

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990504

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970509

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL