Global Patent Index - EP 0775221 B1

EP 0775221 B1 2002-12-18 - PROCESS OF MAKING POLYBENZAZOLE NONWOVEN FABRIC

Title (en)

PROCESS OF MAKING POLYBENZAZOLE NONWOVEN FABRIC

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYBENZAZOL-VLIESSTOFF

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE ETOFFE NON TISSEE DE POLYBENZAZOLE

Publication

EP 0775221 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95928723 A

Priority

  • JP 18242094 A
  • US 9509818 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9604413A1] A continuous process for preparing nonwoven fabrics of polybenzazole filaments, which comprises spinning at least two polybenzazole dope filaments from a spinning head (1) simultaneously, through a quench chamber (2), over godet rolls (3), through an aspirator (4) and intermingling and depositing the filaments on a substantially planar collecting surface (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 10/00; D01D 10/06; D01F 6/74; D04H 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/12 (2006.01); D01F 6/74 (2006.01); D04H 3/009 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/74 (2013.01); D04H 3/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9604413 A1 19960215; CA 2194989 A1 19960215; DE 69529221 D1 20030130; DE 69529221 T2 20030821; EP 0775221 A1 19970528; EP 0775221 A4 19971112; EP 0775221 B1 20021218; ES 2186726 T3 20030516; JP 3541966 B2 20040714; JP H0849156 A 19960220; MX 9700815 A 19970930

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070802

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060803

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TOYOBO CO. LTD

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060802

2007-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060803

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060802

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050815

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050809

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-07-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050728

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-07-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050727

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186726 T3

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69529221 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69529221 P 20030130

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

1998-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980820

1998-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOYOBO CO., LTD.

1997-11-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

1997-11-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19970925

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1997-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970125

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL