Global Patent Index - EP 0775223 B1

EP 0775223 B1 2000-05-10 - DEVICE FOR COMBING COTTON OR COTTON-LIKE FIBRES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR COMBING COTTON OR COTTON-LIKE FIBRES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM KÄMMEN VON BAUMWOLLE ODER BAUMWOLLÄHNLICHEN FASERN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PEIGNAGE DE COTON OU DE FIBRES COTONNEUSES

Publication

EP 0775223 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95926831 A

Priority

  • DE 9500994 W
  • DE 4428296 A
  • DE 19523949 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9605342A1] The invention concerns a device for combing cotton or cotton-like fibres, the device having tongs to hold the fibres during combing, a circular comber with a sector designed to comb the fibres held by the tongs, and an essentially positionally stable pull-off device for pulling the fibres combed by the comber out of the collector, the pull-off device consisting of at least one lower roller and an upper roller parallel to it. The combing device also has a top comb for combing the rear side of the fibres pulled out and a device for drawing off the combed slivers. In order to reduce the number of moving parts, to increase the rotational speed of the combing machine and to improve the quality of the combed slivers produced, the device is designed so that the upper pull-off roller (5) is located close to the path of motion of the tips of the combing sector of the circular comber (1) and that the lower pull-off roller (7) pivots about the axis of the upper pull-off roller (5), in accordance with a given law of motion, through the path of motion of the tips of the circular comber (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 19/20; D01G 19/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/20 (2006.01); D01G 19/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/26 (2013.01); D01G 19/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9605342 A1 19960222; CN 1159838 A 19970917; EP 0775223 A1 19970528; EP 0775223 B1 20000510; JP H10504069 A 19980414

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050728

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-10-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2000-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH IT LI

1998-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981012

1997-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970130

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH IT LI