Global Patent Index - EP 0775240 B1

EP 0775240 B1 2000-10-25 - FASTENER FOR CORRUGATED SHEETING

Title (en)

FASTENER FOR CORRUGATED SHEETING

Title (de)

BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENT FÜR GEWELLTE DACHEINDECKUNGEN

Title (fr)

ATTACHE POUR REVETEMENT ONDULE

Publication

EP 0775240 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95928557 A

Priority

  • GB 9501919 W
  • GB 9416447 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2292432A] A drill screw (10) (Figure 10) or stud or hook bolt (51) (Figure 8) for securing flexible corrugated sheets (15) (Figure 10) to a structural support (17), co-operates with a spacer (12) which has a body (13) for insertion through a hole (14) in the corrugated sheeting, and a flange (16) near to the upper end of the body (13) for overlapping the sheeting (15) around the hole (14). The body (13) has a hole through which a screw (10) passes. The screw (10) secures the spacer (12) to the supporting structure (17). The corrugated sheeting (15) is held down by the flange (16) of the spacer (12). The spacer (12) thus controls the force on and compression of the corrugated sheeting (15). The flange (16) may include several annular ribs (70) and the spacer (12) may be tapered inwardly at its base (74). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/3606 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

GB 2292432 A 19960221; GB 2292432 B 19980701; GB 9516696 D0 19951018; AU 3227895 A 19960307; AU 694544 B2 19980723; DE 69519230 D1 20001130; DE 69519230 T2 20010531; EP 0775240 A1 19970528; EP 0775240 B1 20001025; ES 2153043 T3 20010216; GB 9416447 D0 19941005; HK 1014570 A1 20000420; HU 221522 B 20021128; HU T77567 A 19980629; PL 179762 B1 20001031; PL 318692 A1 19970707; PT 775240 E 20010430; RU 2152490 C1 20000710; WO 9605387 A1 19960222

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050815

2005-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-04-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-08-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030828

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030808

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-08-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020816

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010824

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-08-06 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20010806

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153043 T3

2001-01-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519230 20001130

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

1997-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970804

1997-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970317

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT