Global Patent Index - EP 0775313 B1

EP 0775313 B1 2000-03-15 - Method of capturing species from liquids and apparatus therefor

Title (en)

Method of capturing species from liquids and apparatus therefor

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Einfangen von einem Ligand aus einer Flüssigkeit und Vorrichtung zur dessen Ausführung

Title (fr)

Procédé de capture d'un ligand contenu dans un liquide et appareil pour sa mise en oeuvre

Publication

EP 0775313 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95918081 A

Priority

  • GB 9501056 W
  • GB 9409348 A
  • GB 9423867 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9531726A1] A species such as a microorganism, e.g. Legionella, Giardia or Cryptosporidium, is captured by first attracting plastics coated magnetic beads or other magnetically attractable particles to a solid support such as stainless steel mesh, which particles have a selective affinity for the species, e.g. by virtue of an antibody coating, and contacting a sample containing the species with the particles on the solid support. The beads bearing the capture species may be released by reduction of the magnetic attraction of the support for the beads, e.g. by turning off an electromagnet used to magnetise the support.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/543; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/569

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/543 (2006.01); G01N 33/553 (2006.01); G01N 33/569 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/56911 (2013.01); G01N 33/54326 (2013.01); Y10S 435/803 (2013.01); Y10S 436/806 (2013.01); Y10S 436/824 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9531726 A1 19951123; AT 190727 T 20000415; AU 2414695 A 19951205; AU 697863 B2 19981022; CA 2189958 A1 19951123; CA 2189958 C 20050419; DE 69515675 D1 20000420; DE 69515675 T2 20000720; EP 0775313 A1 19970528; EP 0775313 B1 20000315; JP 3339026 B2 20021028; JP H10500213 A 19980106; NZ 285139 A 19981028; US 5834197 A 19981110

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150509

2015-06-03 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150509

2015-05-20 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20150510

2015-05-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69515675

2015-05-10 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69515675

2014-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140530

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140529

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-07-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-04-05 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-04-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-02-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: GENERA TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED

2002-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SEVERN TRENT (G.T.) LIMITED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Free text: 20011017 *GENERA TECHNOLOGIES LTD:UNIT 5F LYNX BUSINESS PARK FORDHAM ROAD, SNAILWELL SUFFOLK CB68 7NY

2001-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Free text: 20011017 *GENERA TECHNOLOGIES LTD

2001-03-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2000-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-06-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-06-15 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515675 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-15 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190727 T 20000415

1997-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970806

1997-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961127

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE