Global Patent Index - EP 0775453 B1

EP 0775453 B1 2000-01-26 - Crash helmet for motorcyclists and the like, provided with adjustable aeration devices

Title (en)

Crash helmet for motorcyclists and the like, provided with adjustable aeration devices

Title (de)

Sturzhelm für Motorradfahrer und dergleichen mit verstellbaren Belüftungseinrichtungen

Title (fr)

Casque de protection pour motocyclistes et similaires muni de dispositifs d'aération réglables

Publication

EP 0775453 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95830486 A

Priority

EP 95830486 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0775453A1] Crash helmet for motorcyclists and the like, provided on top of the cap (1) with at least an air intake (2), above which a shaped flange (3) is positioned provided with an air intake window (4) and at least two air outlet channels (5, 5a), a translable slider (8) being provided above said flange, suitable to fully or partly close said inlet window (4) and said outlet channels (5, 5a), ensuring the regularity of the air flow from within the helmet and therefore the absence of turbolences, vibrations and annoying noises near the air intake, an isosceles or trapezoid spoiler (15) being positioned under said flange (3), which spoiler is connected through its greater base (17) with the air intake channel and through its sides edges (18, 18a) with the two divergent air outlet channels (5, 5a). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A42B 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/281 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0775453 A1 19970528; EP 0775453 B1 20000126; DE 69514811 D1 20000302; DE 69514811 T2 20001012; ES 2142467 T3 20000416

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151124

2016-03-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151122

2015-12-16 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20151122

2015-11-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69514811

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20141014

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141107

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141118

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141023

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141008

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-02-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2006-11-17 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2006-11-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-09-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-07-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011124

2001-10-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20011024

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20001017

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142467 T3

2000-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69514811 20000302

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WILLIAM BLANC & CIE CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1999-09-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BREVETTI EUROPA S.R.L.

1998-11-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981005

1997-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960917

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE