Global Patent Index - EP 0775454 B1

EP 0775454 B1 2001-04-04 - Sportsshoe

Title (en)

Sportsshoe

Title (de)

Sportschuh

Title (fr)

Chaussure de sport

Publication

EP 0775454 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96113790 A

Priority

CH 333895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0775454A1] The boot has a foot part (4) and an upper part (5) with link connections (9,9') so that the angle included by the link axis and the plane formed by the shoe sole can be changed. The distance between the link axle and the shoe sole may also be changed. One of the pivot points (9) of the link connection is movable in relation to the plane (3) of the sole. The inside link connection has a disc (7) and a slope (11) forcing the pivot point away from the sole when the upper is tilted towards the toe-part of the boot.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/0466 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0775454 A1 19970528; EP 0775454 B1 20010404; AT 200191 T 20010415; CH 689930 A5 20000215; DE 59606704 D1 20010510; JP H09168403 A 19970630

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020401

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-07-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606704 20010510

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR IT SE

2001-04-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200191 T 20010415

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991029

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971118

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR IT SE