Global Patent Index - EP 0775525 B1

EP 0775525 B1 2001-12-12 - Torque absorbing mechanism

Title (en)

Torque absorbing mechanism

Title (de)

Drehmomentabstützung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'absorption de couple

Publication

EP 0775525 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96116399 A

Priority

DE 19543364 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0775525A1] The torque loading system is for two closely adjacent rollers (1,2) running on horizontal axes. The rollers have stub shafts (5,6) at the ends, running in support bearings. The system may compensate for the reaction of the driving torque. The rollers may be used for comminution of solid material and may move apart slightly under heavy loading. The bearings are mounted on pivoted arms (11,12) which have the pivot points slightly offset from the axes of the rollers. There are brake shoes or torque-reaction components (9,10) bearing on the rollers on the sides remote from the nip (19) between the rollers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 4/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 4/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 4/426 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19543364 A1 19970522; DK 0775525 T3 20020402; EP 0775525 A1 19970528; EP 0775525 B1 20011212; US 5779126 A 19980714

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-12 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59608436

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130628

2013-06-03 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-05-11 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Effective date: 20120410

2012-05-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20120410

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111024

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20111019

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110106

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608436 20020124

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR LI

2001-07-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: A. FRIEDR. FLENDER GMBH

2000-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000724

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970609

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR LI