Global Patent Index - EP 0775554 B1

EP 0775554 B1 2000-04-26 - Bolt driving tool with shock absorber

Title (en)

Bolt driving tool with shock absorber

Title (de)

Bolzensetzgerät mit Stossdämpfer

Title (fr)

Outil de scellement de chevilles avec un amortisseur

Publication

EP 0775554 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810639 A

Priority

DE 19544105 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0775554A1] The tool housing (1) incorporates a handle (2). A piston guide (4) is axially displaced in relation to the housing against spring force. An ignition pin guide (8) is axially displaced in relation to the housing and is connected to the piston guide contrary to the direction of firing. The ignition pin guide co-operates with a shock absorber (17) resting against a contact surface (7) of the housing, facing the firing direction. The housing has a chamber (24) for guiding the piston guide whose axial length (LK) at most corresponds to the axial length (LA) of the chamber defined by the firing direction side end sides of the housing and of the ignition pin guide. The shock absorber consists of a cylinder (18) containing a fluid under gas pressure, and a pressure piston (16) possessing throttle openings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25C 1/14; B25C 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/14 (2006.01); B25C 1/18 (2006.01); B25F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25F 5/006 (2013.01); B25C 1/143 (2013.01); B25C 1/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0775554 A1 19970528; EP 0775554 B1 20000426; AU 710809 B2 19990930; AU 7189996 A 19970605; CN 1055041 C 20000802; CN 1158779 A 19970910; DE 19544105 A1 19970528; JP H09174457 A 19970708; KR 100403650 B1 20040319; US 5884828 A 19990323

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605032

- Effective date: 20110401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090903

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060927

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060927

2007-05-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060928

2005-09-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050906

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605032 20000531

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991001

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971128

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE