Global Patent Index - EP 0775561 B1

EP 0775561 B1 2002-09-11 - GLASS FIBER MAT FOR STAMPABLE SHEET, PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF THE MAT, STAMPABLE SHEET MADE FROM SAID MAT, PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF THE SHEET, AND EQUIPMENT FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

GLASS FIBER MAT FOR STAMPABLE SHEET, PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF THE MAT, STAMPABLE SHEET MADE FROM SAID MAT, PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF THE SHEET, AND EQUIPMENT FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

GLASVLIES FÜR BESTEMPELBARE FOLIE, VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN DIESES VLIESES, BESTEMPELBARE FOLIE HERGESTELLT AUS DIESEM VLIES, VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN DIESER FOLIE UND VORRICHTUNG ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

MAT DE FIBRES DE VERRE POUR FEUILLE A ESTAMPER, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CE MAT, FEUILLE A ESTAMPER FABRIQUEE A PARTIR DE CE MAT, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE LA FEUILLE ET EQUIPEMENT DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 0775561 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96916302 A

Priority

  • JP 9601507 W
  • JP 14093795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9640477A1] A glass fiber mat for stampable sheet wherein long fibers and short fibers are not separated from each other but dispersed in each other uniformly even after molding and therefore exhibit their respective characteristics. The equipement is provided with a laminator of double belt press type which laminates a fed glass mat with a molten thermoplastic resin extruded from an extruder and a film wound off, presses the laminate thus obtained under heating to impregnate the mat with the molten thermoplastic resin and cools the resulting laminate under pressure to form a sheet, means for feeding a glass mat to the laminator, and a pair of rollers placed between the feeding means and the endless belt of the laminator and cutting part of the glass fibers of the mat into short fibers by passing the mat between them under loading. These rollers are made of steel and apply a linear load to the glass mat to thereby cut the continuous fibers and disperse the resulting short fibers in long fibers uniformly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29B 11/16; B29C 70/18; B29C 70/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 11/00 (2006.01); B29C 70/08 (2006.01); B29C 70/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 70/508 (2013.01); B24D 11/00 (2013.01); B29C 70/081 (2013.01); Y10S 428/902 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1044 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1314 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1321 (2013.01); Y10T 428/237 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24124 (2013.01); Y10T 428/249946 (2015.04); Y10T 428/24995 (2015.04); Y10T 428/27 (2013.01); Y10T 442/2951 (2015.04); Y10T 442/2992 (2015.04); Y10T 442/60 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9640477 A1 19961219; DE 69623572 D1 20021017; EP 0775561 A1 19970528; EP 0775561 A4 19980708; EP 0775561 B1 20020911; US 6068715 A 20000530

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-06-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030605

2002-12-12 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021212

2002-12-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623572 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2001-07-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JAPAN GMT CO., LTD.

2000-03-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000210

1998-07-08 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19980520

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1997-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970121

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE