Global Patent Index - EP 0775592 B1

EP 0775592 B1 2002-09-11 - Thermal image-forming process

Title (en)

Thermal image-forming process

Title (de)

Wärmeempfindliches Bildaufzeichnungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé thermique pour former des images

Publication

EP 0775592 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96203125 A

Priority

  • EP 96203125 A
  • EP 95203244 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0775592A1] A thermal image forming process comprising the steps of: (i) bringing an outermost layer of a recording material comprising at least one thermosensitive element, comprising a substantially light-insensitive silver salt and a reducing agent therefor in thermal working relationship therewith, on a support into contact with a heat source; (ii) applying heat from the heat source imagewise to the recording material while maintaining mutual contact to but with relative movement between the recording material and the heat source; and (iii) separating the recording material from the heat source, characterized in that the dynamic frictional coefficient during the contact between the outermost surface of the recording material and the heat source has a maximum value of less than 0.3. The outermost layer in contact with the heat source may be the outermost layer of the thermosensitive element, a protective layer applied to the thermosensitive element or a layer on the opposite side of the support to the thermosensitive element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/38; G03C 1/498; G03C 8/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/498 (2006.01); B41M 5/40 (2006.01); B41M 5/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/4989 (2013.01); G03C 1/49872 (2013.01); B41M 5/44 (2013.01); G03C 1/32 (2013.01); G03C 1/7614 (2013.01); G03C 1/825 (2013.01); G03C 1/85 (2013.01); G03C 2001/7488 (2013.01); G03C 2001/7628 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0775592 A1 19970528; EP 0775592 B1 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161107

2016-11-30 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161107

2016-11-08 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69623573

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-08-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-01-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623573 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

1998-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981104

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971128

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB