Global Patent Index - EP 0775754 B1

EP 0775754 B1 2000-02-02 - Process for preparing a composite metal matrix rotor

Title (en)

Process for preparing a composite metal matrix rotor

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Metallmatrixverbundrotors

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un rotor composite à matrice métallique

Publication

EP 0775754 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402499 A

Priority

FR 9513832 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0775754A1] A method is claimed for the fabrication of a rotor in a composite material with a metal matrix (1, 2, 3, 26), made up of a metal block containing fibres arranged in circles. The method comprises: (a) constructing a metal medium (1) made up of a plate and a shaft; (b) placing a metal disc (3) on the shaft with a metal ring (2) that extends around the disc (3); (c) winding the fibres, coated with the matrix material, around the shaft and between the disc (3) and the plate; (d) arranging a metal casing (26) around the plate and the fibres, the ring (2) passing beyond the casing (26) and the shaft and freeing the ring (2) from the disc (3); (e) surrounding the medium (1), the casing (26) and the ring (2) with a sleeve (27) fitted with a degassing aperture (28); (f) compressing the sleeve (27) by hot isostatic compression until the ring (2) embeds itself and attains a determined level; and (g) removing the sleeve (27) and machining the metal block to a desired shape should this be necessary.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/02 (2006.01); B21C 37/00 (2006.01); B30B 5/02 (2006.01); C22C 47/00 (2006.01); C22C 47/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 47/064 (2013.01); C22C 47/00 (2013.01); B22F 2998/00 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49318 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4932 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B22F 2998/00 + C22C 47/064
  2. B22F 2998/00 + C22C 47/04

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0775754 A1 19970528; EP 0775754 B1 20000202; CA 2190567 A1 19970523; CA 2190567 C 20040803; DE 69606502 D1 20000309; DE 69606502 T2 20000621; FR 2741383 A1 19970523; FR 2741383 B1 19971212; JP 3308174 B2 20020729; JP H09192892 A 19970729; US 5745994 A 19980505

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151121

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151121

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151121

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69606502

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151116

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141023

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141023

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-06-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120517 AND 20120523

2006-02-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-01-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-01-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-03-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606502 20000309

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 22C 47/00 A

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990614

1997-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961203

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT