Global Patent Index - EP 0775769 B1

EP 0775769 B1 2000-03-15 - Device for clamping an underwinding yarn at a spindle of a spinning or twisting machine

Title (en)

Device for clamping an underwinding yarn at a spindle of a spinning or twisting machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Klemmen eines Unterwindefadens an der Spindel einer Ringspinn- oder -zwirnmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour pincer le fil de sous-renvidage à une broche d'un métier à filer ou à retordre

Publication

EP 0775769 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118470 A

Priority

EP 95118470 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0775769A1] The appts., to clamp the underwinding of yarn (7) at the spindle (2) of a ring spinning or twisting machine, has at least one activating unit (11) of the operating assembly (10) fixed at the ring spinning or twisting machine, which is only moved to come into contact with the clamping sleeve (8). A unit (12) holds the clamping sleeve (8) in the clamping setting, independent of the working of the operating assembly (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0775769 A1 19970528; EP 0775769 B1 20000315; DE 59508008 D1 20000420

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051123

2004-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2003-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-01-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030116

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20021126

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-11-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011122

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508008 20000420

2000-04-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1998-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971219

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971029

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI