Global Patent Index - EP 0775772 B1

EP 0775772 B1 2001-05-16 - Method for preparing a weather resistant fabric coated with evaporated aluminium

Title (en)

Method for preparing a weather resistant fabric coated with evaporated aluminium

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines wetterechten alubedampften Stoffes

Title (fr)

Procédé de préparation d'une étoffe revêtue d'aluminium vaporisé et résistante aux intempéries

Publication

EP 0775772 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115402 A

Priority

DE 19540451 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0775772A2] In production of a weather-resistant, aluminium-coated material for outdoor use, (a) a synthetic yarn is woven to a fabric, (b) the fabric is thoroughly washed clean with an anionic washing agent, (c) the fabric is pre-dried to 1% residual moisture, followed by drying to remove residual moisture, (d) aluminium is vaporised onto the surface of the fabric, and (e) the fabric is treated with a dressing containing 0.2-2.5 wt.% of a fluoro carbon resin, followed by dressings with up to 3.0% of phosphoric acid ester, up to 2.5% of N-hydroxymethyl melamine resin, and up to 1.5% urea.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 11/83

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06M 11/83 (2006.01); D06M 13/292 (2006.01); D06M 15/256 (2006.01); D06M 15/423 (2006.01); D06N 3/00 (2006.01); E04F 10/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/02 (2013.01); D06M 11/83 (2013.01); D06M 13/292 (2013.01); D06M 15/256 (2013.01); D06M 15/423 (2013.01); D06N 3/0059 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19540451 C1 19970430; AT 201242 T 20010615; EP 0775772 A2 19970528; EP 0775772 A3 19970723; EP 0775772 B1 20010516; ES 2159668 T3 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070926

2008-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070926

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070925

2008-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060928

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-20 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060920

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060919

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060918

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050925

2005-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050819

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SATTLER AG

2002-02-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SATTLER AG

2002-01-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: LAUTERBURG & CIE AG TRANSFER- SATTLER AG

2001-11-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SATTLER AG

2001-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159668 T3

2001-08-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606904 20010621

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

2001-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201242 T 20010615

2000-06-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000428

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970829

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI NL