Global patent index - EP 0775780 B1

EP 0775780 B1 2000-08-23 - Method for renewing railway tracks

Title (en)

Method for renewing railway tracks

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erneuerung von Gleisanlagen

Title (fr)

Procédé de renouvellement de voies ferrées

Publication

EP 0775780 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402553 A

Priority

FR 9514001 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0775780A1] The train has a series of trucks, including three with pallets of new sleepers. One is for removing old sleepers, and one with two conveyors for old and new sleepers. It has a system for lifting the old rails and depositing them on either side of the track. A lower conveyor (13) is used for removing old sleepers (4) and an upper conveyor (15) for delivering new ones. It has an excavator for lifting part of the old ballast, and a system (18) for laying the new rails on the new sleepers (3). The layer (16) for the new sleepers is situated behind the lower section of the ballast excavator, so that the new sleepers are positioned across the track and laid on a remaining bed of ballast. The new rails are then fixed to the sleepers and the excavated ballast is redistributed between them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 29/05; E01B 27/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/11 (2006.01); E01B 29/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/11 (2013.01); E01B 29/05 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0775780 A1 19970528; EP 0775780 B1 20000823; AT 195776 T 20000915; DE 69609928 D1 20000928; DE 69609928 T2 20010322; FR 2741640 A1 19970530; FR 2741640 B1 19971226

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-11-27 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69609928

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69609928

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-28

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2000-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 195776

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991022

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971117

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI