Global Patent Index - EP 0775783 B1

EP 0775783 B1 2000-12-06 - Shelter made of panels assembled in a polyhedron

Title (en)

Shelter made of panels assembled in a polyhedron

Title (de)

Schutzgebäude aus zu einem Polyeder zusammengebauten Paneelen

Title (fr)

Abri constitué de panneaux assemblés selon un polyèdre

Publication

EP 0775783 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402104 A

Priority

FR 9511789 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0775783A1] The shelter is made of polygonal panels assembled to form a dome shaped or spherical polyhedron. The panels have an outer, watertight facing (1), a layer of insulation (2) and an inner facing (3). On each side of the panel are side pieces (4) with shaped sections (6) which are designed to be placed against each other at the required angle. The panels are held together by one or more metal, U-shaped clips (8). Each clip goes around the two side sections (4) and clip into the shaped sections (6). The side sections are inserted between the out and inner facings. The side sections form a continuous frame around each panel. The side sections are joined to positioning tongues which determine the relative position of adjacent panels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/343; E04B 1/32; E04B 1/61

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/32 (2006.01); E04B 1/343 (2006.01); E04B 1/61 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/34321 (2013.01); E04B 1/3211 (2013.01); E04B 1/6116 (2013.01); E04B 1/6162 (2013.01); E04B 2001/3276 (2013.01); E04B 2001/3288 (2013.01); E04B 2001/3294 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2739645 A1 19970411; FR 2739645 B1 19980206; DE 69611153 D1 20010111; DE 69611153 T2 20010621; EP 0775783 A1 19970528; EP 0775783 B1 20001206; US 5651220 A 19970729

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-05-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20011002

2002-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CHAMAYOU GERARD DIT FELIX

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20011031

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011002

2001-04-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010308

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69611153

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-11

2000-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB LI NL

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990503

1997-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971009

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB LI NL