Global Patent Index - EP 0775787 B1

EP 0775787 B1 2000-05-10 - Building roof

Title (en)

Building roof

Title (de)

Hausdach

Title (fr)

Toit pour bâtiment

Publication

EP 0775787 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96118439 A

Priority

DE 19543330 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0775787A1] The building roof comprises a complete roof structure with hinge joints and runs from building wall to building wall. The roof is an insulating self-supporting box structure with battens and plates.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 7/22; E04B 7/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/22 (2006.01); E04B 7/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/24 (2013.01); E04B 7/225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19543330 A1 19970522; EP 0775787 A1 19970528; EP 0775787 B1 20000510

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-06-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040601

2002-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021121

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-09-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-08-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: UNIDEK BOUWELEMENTEN B.V.

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-18 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001118

2000-10-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20001024

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20001019

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605179 20000615

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR LU NL

1999-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990408

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970430

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR LU NL