Global Patent Index - EP 0775816 B1

EP 0775816 B1 2000-03-22 - V-type piston engine with measurement pickup device

Title (en)

V-type piston engine with measurement pickup device

Title (de)

V-Kolbenmotor mit Messaufnahmevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Moteur à pistons en V muni d'un dispositif de prise de mesures

Publication

EP 0775816 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402498 A

Priority

FR 9513833 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0775816A1] The engine has two rows of cylinders (10,20). One of the rows of cylinders (10) provides for normal admission, compression, combustion and expansion of a fuel/air mixture. The second row of cylinders (20) contains inert pistons (21) and a closed air-filled combustion chamber (23). Each of the inert pistons has an outer face towards the combustion chamber which carries telemetering equipment in the form of an emitter (30) with a rotor (31) which interacts with a stator (32). The inert pistons and connecting rods (22) on the inert side are lightened to compensate for the weight of the measuring equipment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 77/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01M 15/04 (2006.01); F02B 75/22 (2006.01); F02B 77/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/22 (2013.01); F02B 77/08 (2013.01); F02B 2275/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0775816 A1 19970528; EP 0775816 B1 20000322; DE 69607294 D1 20000427; DE 69607294 T2 20000810; ES 2144713 T3 20000616; FR 2741387 A1 19970523; FR 2741387 B1 19971212; JP 3327793 B2 20020924; JP H09177561 A 19970708; US 5710375 A 19980120

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051121

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031213

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-07-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-11-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021122

2002-11-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021122

2002-11-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011121

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-05 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20011105

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011023

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-08 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20011008

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144713 T3

2000-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000410

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607294 20000427

2000-04-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-12-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HISPANO-SUIZA

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990805

1997-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961203

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE