Global Patent Index - EP 0775821 B1

EP 0775821 B1 2000-05-10 - Method and apparatus for injecting fuel in a reciprocating internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for injecting fuel in a reciprocating internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Einspritzen von Brennstoff bei einer Hubkolbenbrennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'injection de combustible dans un moteur à combustion interne à piston alternatif

Publication

EP 0775821 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810733 A

Priority

EP 95810733 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0775821A1] The method involves opening the nozzles in a variable sequence. The total fuel quantity for a working cycle is injected via a single nozzle, esp. for partial engine loading. The injection valves are opened at different crankshaft angles and the sequence of opening is varied between successive operating cycles. The difference in crankshaft angles at which the valves are opened is at least 4 degrees. The injection process for all injection nozzles is terminated simultaneously. A sensor connected to a controller determines the crankshaft angle. Two controllable injection devices with nozzles or two directly driven nozzles can be used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 63/00; F02M 51/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/14 (2006.01); F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 59/08 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/00 (2013.01); F02M 51/00 (2013.01); F02M 59/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0775821 A1 19970528; EP 0775821 B1 20000510; CN 1086017 C 20020605; CN 1156789 A 19970813; DE 59508329 D1 20000615; DK 0775821 T3 20000807; FI 108313 B 20011231; FI 964633 A0 19961120; FI 964633 A 19970525; JP 3896178 B2 20070322; JP H09170525 A 19970630; KR 100443036 B1 20041103

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

- Effective date: 20151124

2015-11-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59508329

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-06-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110601

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091201

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091112

- Year of fee payment: 15

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-07-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508329

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR IT NL

2000-02-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WAERTSILAE NSD SCHWEIZ AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-03-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980114

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971030

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR IT NL

1997-05-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT;SI