Global patent index - EP 0775871 B1

EP 0775871 B1 2000-04-05 - Baking and roasting oven muffle with a heat insulating coating

Title (en)

Baking and roasting oven muffle with a heat insulating coating

Title (de)

Back- und Bratofenmuffel mit einer wärmeisolierenden Umhüllung

Title (fr)

Moufle de four rôtir et cuire au four avec envelope calorifuge

Publication

EP 0775871 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96118074 A

Priority

DE 29518429 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0775871A1] The oven has a heat-insulating enclosure (2) which is formed from layers (4-7) of aluminium foil (3). The individual layers are separated from one another by spacers (8), which are made from an insulating material. The enclosure may be divided into heat insulation which surrounds the oven jacket (10), and that which covers its rear wall. Between a minimum of four and a maximum of six individual layers may be used in the enclosure, and the spacing between them may be from roughly 3 to 12 mm, and preferably from 4 to 6 mm. The insulation matting which covers the rear wall may also overlap the edge of the oven jacket.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29518429 U1 19961219; EP 0775871 A1 19970528; EP 0775871 B1 20000405

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051112

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2001-07-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20001112

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001211

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-11-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001112

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000620

2000-07-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604879

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000405

1999-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981130

1997-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970623

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT