Global Patent Index - EP 0775875 B1

EP 0775875 B1 2001-05-23 - Air dehumidifying and water heating device

Title (en)

Air dehumidifying and water heating device

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Luftentfeuchtung und Wassererwärmung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de déshumidification d'air et de chauffage d'eau

Publication

EP 0775875 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810792 A

Priority

CH 332595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0775875A2] The equipment has a coolant circuit (10) with two coolant compressors (1,2) which can be staggered, an air condenser (5), a water condenser (7), and a valve (11). The valve is a magnetic three-way or passage valve, and guides the coolant via one of the condensers and via a heat convector (15) which heats the air which is cooled in the vaporiser (3), using the residual heat in the hot gas. The heat convector may be arranged before an expansion valve (6) in the coolant circuit, in order heat the air which is cooled in the vaporiser.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 3/153; F24F 3/14; F24F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 3/153 (2006.01); F24F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 5/0096 (2013.01); F24F 3/153 (2013.01); F24F 2221/183 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0775875 A2 19970528; EP 0775875 A3 19971105; EP 0775875 B1 20010523; AT 201503 T 20010615; DE 59606946 D1 20010628

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041114

2004-02-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040226

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2003-11-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031124

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRYNJULV LEGLAND

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606946 20010628

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201503 T 20010615

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-11-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: AIR DEHUMIDIFYING AND WATER HEATING DEVICE

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980430

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI