Global patent index - EP 0775886 B1

EP 0775886 B1 2000-06-14 - Protection device for fast moving objects

Title (en)

Protection device for fast moving objects

Title (de)

Schutzeinrichtung für sich rasch bewegende Objekte

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection pour des objets en mouvement rapide

Publication

EP 0775886 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96117063 A

Priority

DE 19543489 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0775886A1] An active element, such as a flare (12), which has at least one decoy charge, can be ejected from a dispenser (10) on the object. The element is connected by a line (14) to the dispenser, and is ignited on leaving the latter. It is towed along in the burning state for a short time, and is then released in the burning state by severing the line. The latter may be able to extend, and the time at which the severing occurs may be adjustable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 5/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 5/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 5/15 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0775886 A1 19970528; EP 0775886 B1 20000614; DE 19543489 C1 19970626; US 5852254 A 19981222

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151024

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20151024

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59605437

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL WAFFE MUNITION GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59605437

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59605437

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: THUL PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-08-14 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20130724

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070629

2005-10-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-06-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011025

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001002

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605437

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-20

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2000-05-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BUCK NEUE TECHNOLOGIEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990324

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970616

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE