Global Patent Index - EP 0776090 B1

EP 0776090 B1 2000-03-15 - Circuit for cyclically driving several electric consumers

Title (en)

Circuit for cyclically driving several electric consumers

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zum zyklischen Ansteuern mehrerer Verbraucher

Title (fr)

Circuit pour la commande d'amorçage cyclique de plusieurs consommateurs électriques

Publication

EP 0776090 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96117383 A

Priority

DE 29518640 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: JPH09281923A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To provide a periodical driving circuit which has plural loads and allows to supply individual power to these loads. SOLUTION: A fundamental circuit 10 is provided with an oscillator 11 the frequency of which is set through a frequency determining element 15. Through the output terminal A1-A5, the fundamental circuit 10 generates periodic pulses to drive the loads L1-L5. The frequency determining element 15 is parallelly connected with switches 18, which change the frequency of the oscillator while the pulses controlled by the output terminals Al-A5 are generated. Thus, the output pulses from the fundamental circuit 10 change the frequency of the oscillator 11 and the pulse duration of itself.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03K 3/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/14 (2006.01); G08B 5/38 (2006.01); H03K 17/00 (2006.01); H05B 37/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/029 (2013.01); G08B 5/38 (2013.01); Y10T 307/461 (2015.04); Y10T 307/484 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29518640 U1 19970327; AU 7184596 A 19970529; EP 0776090 A1 19970528; EP 0776090 B1 20000315; JP H09281923 A 19971031; US 5892296 A 19990406

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-12-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604667

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091204

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ELECTRONIC ART GALLERY ELEKTRONISCHE WERBEMITTEL

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: LOUPI S.A.R.L.

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-09-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-06-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604667 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2000-03-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

1997-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970917

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970715

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE