Global Patent Index - EP 0776200 A4

EP 0776200 A4 2001-01-17 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DRUG DEPENDENCY

Title (en)

COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DRUG DEPENDENCY

Title (de)

MITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHUTZ VON DROGENABHÄNGIGHEIT

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION ET METHODE DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA TOXICOMANIE

Publication

EP 0776200 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95929519 A

Priority

  • US 28995794 A
  • US 33734994 A
  • US 49664295 A
  • US 9510317 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9604900A1] The present invention provides the use of an agonist which acts at negatively coupled cAMP-linked metabotropic glutamate receptors for the manufacture of a medicament for the treatment of substance dependence disorders.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/045 (2006.01); A61K 31/198 (2006.01); A61K 31/215 (2006.01); A61K 31/465 (2006.01); A61K 31/485 (2006.01); A61K 31/55 (2006.01); A61P 25/30 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07C 62/38 (2006.01); C07C 229/50 (2006.01); C07D 235/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 235/02 (2013.01); A61K 31/00 (2013.01); A61K 31/198 (2013.01); A61K 31/215 (2013.01); C07C 62/38 (2013.01); C07C 229/50 (2013.01); C07C 2102/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] TASCHENBERGER H., ET AL.: "Effect of a metabotropic glutamate agonist, trans-ACPD, on cortical epileptiform activity", NEUROREPORT, vol. 3, no. 7, 1992, pages 629 - 632, XP000943585
  • [A] MORI-OKAMOTO J., ET AL.: "Intracellular mechanisms underlying the suppression of AMPA responses by trans-APCD in cultured chick purkinje neurons", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR NEUROSCIENCES, vol. 4, no. 4, 1993, pages 375 - 386, XP000943572
  • [A] TIZZANO J. P. ET AL.: "Intracerebral 1S, 3R-1-aminocyclopenane-1,3-dicarboxylic acid (1S-3R, ACPD) produces limbic seizures that are not blocked by ionotropic glutamate receptor antagonists", NEUROSCIENCE LETTERS, vol. 162, no. 1-2, 1993, pages 12 - 16, XP000943579
  • See also references of WO 9604900A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9604900 A1 19960222; AU 3325095 A 19960307; CA 2195779 A1 19960222; EP 0776200 A1 19970604; EP 0776200 A4 20010117; JP 3618104 B2 20050209; JP H10504038 A 19980414

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-24 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1013959

2005-02-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040821

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030117

2001-01-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001204

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI MC NL PT SE

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970208

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI MC NL PT SE

1997-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 970208;LV PAYMENT 970208;SI PAYMENT 970208