Global patent index - EP 0776252 B1

EP 0776252 B1 2000-10-18 - SEGMENT ROTARY NOZZLE

Title (en)

SEGMENT ROTARY NOZZLE

Title (de)

SEGMENTROTATIONSDÜSE

Title (fr)

BUSE ROTATIVE A SEGMENTS

Publication

EP 0776252 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94926133 A

Priority

  • DE 4326714 A
  • EP 9402529 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5788156A] PCT No. PCT/EP94/02529 Sec. 371 Date Feb. 16, 1996 Sec. 102(e) Date Feb. 16, 1996 PCT Filed Jul. 29, 1994 PCT Pub. No. WO95/03893 PCT Pub. Date Feb. 9, 1995A device for spraying a liquid has a rotating surface, preferably one with an edge apron which is angled obliquely toward the outside, from whose possibly serrated outer spraying edge the liquid is flung out. The rotating surface is partially covered by a housing which is provided with an opening which leaves a partial circumference free. The device has a reservoir and a flow path for collecting retained drops, in whose circulation a pump is provided which is embodied to reunite collected liquid with the inflowing liquid. A conveying surface of a pump, preferably a friction pump, is disposed coaxially with the axis of rotation of the rotating surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

US 5788156 A 19980804; DE 4326714 A1 19950209; EP 0776252 A1 19970604; EP 0776252 B1 20001018; WO 9503893 A1 19950209

INPADOC legal status

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140728

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140730

2014-08-20 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20140728

2014-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-07-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59409554

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130723

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130904

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130903

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KATZAROV S.A.

2004-10-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO URSULA RENFER-VONNEMANN, CH

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010105

2001-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTSANWALTSBUERO RENFER-VONNEMANN

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MANTIS ULV-SPRUEHGERAETE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409554

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-23

2000-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: KARAGHIOSOFF GIORGIO

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1997-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970818

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960113

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI