Global Patent Index - EP 0776303 B1

EP 0776303 B1 2000-04-19 - COUPLING PIECE FOR DETACHABLY INTERCONNECTING CONTAINERS

Title (en)

COUPLING PIECE FOR DETACHABLY INTERCONNECTING CONTAINERS

Title (de)

KUPPELSTÜCK ZUR LÖSBAREN VERBINDUNG VON CONTAINERN

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE RACCORDEMENT PERMETTANT D'ACCOUPLER DE FACON LIBERABLE DES CONTENEURS

Publication

EP 0776303 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95929054 A

Priority

  • DE 4429358 A
  • DE 19504633 A
  • EP 9503072 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19504633A1] A coupling piece is disclosed for detachably interconnecting the corner fittings of adjacent containers, in particular stacked containers on board of ships. In order to reduce manual operations when coupling containers, semi-automatic coupling pieces that need only to be manually set on a container and pre-locked are known. Complete locking happens automatically when the containers are stacked. Such coupling pieces require however a relatively complex automatic actuating mechanism, in many respects. In order to simplify the automatic actuating mechanism, several mutually offset bearing surfaces (43, 44 and 45) are provided on the locking bolt (21) and may be alternatively brought into a corresponding position to a bearing surface (54) on a spring-loaded slide (23). When a bearing surface (43, 44 or 45) of the locking bolt (21) lies on the bearing surface (54) of the spring-loaded slide (23), the locking bolt is easily and reliably blocked in the desired position of its transverse locking elements (32, 33).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 90/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60P 7/13 (2006.01); B65D 90/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/0013 (2013.01); Y10T 24/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19504633 A1 19960222; CN 1062526 C 20010228; CN 1155872 A 19970730; CZ 9700448 A3 19971217; DE 59508201 D1 20000525; DK 0776303 T3 20000710; EE 9700070 A 19971015; EP 0776303 A1 19970604; EP 0776303 B1 20000419; ES 2145919 T3 20000716; JP 3105258 B2 20001030; JP H10507722 A 19980728; KR 100250164 B1 20000401; PL 179915 B1 20001130; PL 318654 A1 19970707; PT 776303 E 20000831; RU 2130391 C1 19990520; TW 303332 B 19970421; US 5797169 A 19980825; WO 9606027 A1 19960229

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59508201

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-03-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2011-03-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110301

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090822

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090803

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090813

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090902

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-08-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2002-06-28 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-06-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MACGREGOR-CONVER G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20010831

2002-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2001-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010803

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20001025

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000511

2000-08-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000811

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-08-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20000804

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145919 T3

2000-07-12 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20000712

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-07-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508201 20000525

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR IT NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MACGREGOR-CONVER GMBH

1997-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970609

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970203

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR IT NL PT SE