Global Patent Index - EP 0776382 B1

EP 0776382 B1 2001-05-30 - ELECTRO-MAGNETIC PLUGGING MEANS FOR HOT DIP COATING POT

Title (en)

ELECTRO-MAGNETIC PLUGGING MEANS FOR HOT DIP COATING POT

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER VERSCHLUSS FÜR HEISSTAUCHBESCHICHTUNGSTOPF

Title (fr)

BOUCHON ELECTROMAGNETIQUE POUR CUVE D'ENDUCTION A CHAUD PAR TREMPAGE

Publication

EP 0776382 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95925672 A

Priority

  • AU 9500458 W
  • AU PM713394 A
  • AU PN256995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9603533A1] A hot dip coating pot (2) having a strip inlet passage (3) and electro-magnetic plugging means to prevent leakage of bath liquid from the pot through that passage, wherein: the plugging means comprises two magnetic field generators (7) disposed one on each side of the passage; each generator projects an oscillating magnetic field into the passage from at least two poles of opposite polarity that are adjacent the passage and spaced apart in the through direction of the passage; the said at least two poles of each generator are respectively in substantial alignment with the corresponding poles of the other in the transverse direction of the passage; the magnetic fields projected by the generators have flux patterns which are substantially mirror images with reference to a plane of reflection coinciding with a centre plane of the passage; and both generators operate at a frequency of more than seven kiloHertz. When no strip is present the fields combine and extend transversely of the passage. When a strip is present the fields not only plug the passage but also provide restraining forces to prevent deviation of the strip from its intended pass line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 2/00; C23C 2/24; C23C 2/36; C23C 2/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 2/00 (2006.01); C23C 2/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 2/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GB LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9603533 A1 19960208; AT 201718 T 20010615; BR 9408603 A 19971118; BR 9510681 A 19991026; CA 2196056 A1 19960208; CA 2196056 C 20060131; CN 1147616 C 20040428; CN 1154721 A 19970716; DE 69521135 D1 20010705; DE 69521135 T2 20020307; EP 0776382 A1 19970604; EP 0776382 A4 19990210; EP 0776382 B1 20010530; ES 2160170 T3 20011101; FI 119326 B 20081015; FI 970334 A0 19970127; FI 970334 A 19970127; IN 191638 B 20031206; JP 3811817 B2 20060823; JP H10502972 A 19980317; NZ 289790 A 19980527

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130726

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130727

2014-08-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140807

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130726

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130726

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130727

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69521135

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130726

2014-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 201718 T

- Effective date: 20130726

2014-03-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-02-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140201

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120711

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-10-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Effective date: 20060712

2006-01-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2005-11-30 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2160170 T3

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69521135 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB LU NL SE

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201718 T 20010615

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991208

1999-02-10 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19981228

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB LU NL SE

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970127

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB LU NL SE