Global Patent Index - EP 0776421 B1

EP 0776421 B1 2000-05-31 - FUEL INJECTION DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZEINRICHTUNG FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0776421 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96901228 A

Priority

  • DE 9600161 W
  • DE 29502829 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5692476A] PCT No. PCT/DE96/00161 Sec. 371 Date Oct. 18, 1996 Sec. 102(e) Date Oct. 18, 1996 PCT Filed Feb. 2, 1996 PCT Pub. No. WO96/26362 PCT Pub. Date Aug. 29, 1996A fuel injection device for internal combustion engines with a high pressure fuel pump that delivers fuel from a low pressure chamber via high pressure lines to at least one injection valve that protrudes into the combustion chamber of the engine to be fed. The device includes a through flow limiting valve that defines a maximum fuel flow quantity in one or a number of high pressure lines and has a valve member, which can move axially and in its closed position, can be brought against a valve seat counter to the force of a restoring spring by fuel flowing toward the injection valve when a maximum fuel flow quantity is exceeded. Wherein the fuel flow through the valve member that is lifted up from its seat can be adjusted in at least one throttle location in the valve member. In order to be able to detect even extremely small leakage quantities, the through flow limiting valve is designed so that in each injection, the valve member executes a stroke motion toward the valve seat but only reaches it when there is a leaky high pressure line, wherein when there are low leakage quantities, the initial position of the valve member moves toward the valve seat during the injection pauses.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 55/02; F02M 63/00; F02M 63/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/00 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0295 (2013.01); F02M 55/02 (2013.01); F02M 55/025 (2013.01); F02M 63/0005 (2013.01); F02M 63/0205 (2013.01); F02M 63/0215 (2013.01); Y10T 137/7869 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5692476 A 19971202; CN 1064743 C 20010418; CN 1145654 A 19970319; DE 29502829 U1 19960620; EP 0776421 A1 19970604; EP 0776421 B1 20000531; JP H09512325 A 19971209; KR 100413555 B1 20040403; WO 9626362 A1 19960829

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-23 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20020924

2003-04-23 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20020924

2003-01-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020325

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-02-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020221

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: L'ORANGE GMBH

- Effective date: 20010226

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-08-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605356 20000706

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981103

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970228

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT