Global patent index - EP 0776451 B1

EP 0776451 B1 2000-01-12 - PROCESS FOR SETTING THE STATIC OVERHEATING IN EXPANSION VALVES FOR COOLANT CIRCUITS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR SETTING THE STATIC OVERHEATING IN EXPANSION VALVES FOR COOLANT CIRCUITS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG DER STATISCHEN ÜBERHITZUNG AN EXPANSIONSVENTILEN FUR KÄLTEMITTELKREISLÄUFE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REGLAGE DE LA SURCHAUFFE STATIQUE AU NIVEAU DES SOUPAPES DE DETENTE DE CIRCUITS D'AGENT FRIGORIFIQUE

Publication

EP 0776451 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95944011 A

Priority

  • DE 4430497 A
  • EP 9502662 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4430497A1] To effect the adjustment, the expansion valve is first set for a basic coolant (Ro) to a substantially constant static overheating temperature ( DELTA toh) in a predetermined working range of the evaporator temperature and, when the coolant circuit is filled with a replacement coolant (R1, R2) differing from the basic coolant (Ro), the pre-tension of its adjusting spring (46) is adjusted in accordance with a specification suited to the difference between the vapour pressure curves of the replacement coolant and those of the basic coolant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 41/06; G05D 23/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 41/06 (2006.01); G05D 23/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 41/062 (2013.01); F25B 2400/18 (2013.01); F25B 2600/21 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4430497 A1 19960229; AT 188770 T 20000115; AU 3076595 A 19960322; DK 0776451 T3 20000613; EP 0776451 A1 19970604; EP 0776451 B1 20000112; ES 2144159 T3 20000601; US 5916250 A 19990629; WO 9607066 A1 19960307

INPADOC legal status

2002-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020731

- Year of fee payment: 08

2002-07-10 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-07-10 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free Format Text: 20020130

2002-06-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020614

- Year of fee payment: 08

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010814

- Year of fee payment: 07

2001-07-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010716

- Year of fee payment: 07

2001-07-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010702

- Year of fee payment: 07

2001-06-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010614

- Year of fee payment: 07

2001-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2000-11-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DANFOSS A/S

- Effective date: 20000923

2000-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000708

2000-06-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-06-05 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2144159

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-03-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PROROGA CONCESSA IN DATA: 26.05.2000;JACOBACCI & P

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59507620

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-02-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 188770

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000115

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990622

1998-12-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: HONEYWELL AG

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970125

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE