Global Patent Index - EP 0776619 B1

EP 0776619 B1 2001-02-28 - Profiled panel and profile having a U-shaped section for a panel

Title (en)

Profiled panel and profile having a U-shaped section for a panel

Title (de)

Profilierte Platte und U-Profil für eine Platte

Title (fr)

Panneau comportant un profilé, et profilé en U pour un panneau

Publication

EP 0776619 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402557 A

Priority

FR 9514162 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0776619A1] The U shaped plastics section for covering a panel has a back (4). Webs (5) extend either side the back to form with it an internal angle (A) less than 90 degrees . The webs have a thickness equal to that of the back. Curved connecting parts (6) which join the webs to the back have a thickness equal to those of the webs and back. The webs have a sharp corner edge (9) and an internal plane surface (10). The webs have an external convex surface (11) which forms an obtuse angle (B) with the internal surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 95/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 95/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 95/04 (2013.01); A47B 2013/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0776619 A1 19970604; EP 0776619 B1 20010228; DE 69611887 D1 20010405; DE 69611887 T2 20010927; ES 2155588 T3 20010516; FR 2741915 A1 19970606; FR 2741915 B1 19980102

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MATHOU MARCEL

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041130

2007-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20041129

2005-11-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051127

2005-07-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041127

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MATHOU MARCEL

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041129

2004-11-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041127

2003-12-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031230

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-12-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031128

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031126

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2155588

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69611887

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-05

2001-04-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010309

2001-03-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-03-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

1998-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981026

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961128

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI