Global Patent Index - EP 0776707 B1

EP 0776707 B1 2000-12-20 - Method of cleaning aggregates from a power plant

Title (en)

Method of cleaning aggregates from a power plant

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Reinigen von Aggregaten einer Kraftwerksanlage

Title (fr)

Procédé de nettoyage d'aggrégats d'une centrale d'énergie

Publication

EP 0776707 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810785 A

Priority

DE 19545035 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0776707A2] The method involves injecting over several hours a heat processed and pressurised steam medium. Then, a quiescent phase is initiated during which the units are cooled down. After cooling of the units at least one further injection is carried out intermittently and which by means of thermal shock produces a cleaning effect. The injection of the medium takes place over a time span of at least 6 hours. It takes place at a temperature greater than 400 degrees C and a dynamic pressure ratio greater than 3.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 7/00; B08B 9/00; F28G 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/10 (2006.01); B08B 7/00 (2006.01); F28G 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28G 5/00 (2013.01); B08B 7/0064 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0776707 A2 19970604; EP 0776707 A3 19980520; EP 0776707 B1 20001220; CN 1131738 C 20031224; CN 1156241 A 19970806; DE 19545035 A1 19970605; JP 3893178 B2 20070314; JP H09173999 A 19970708

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101113

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-08-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606231

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606231

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101113

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091007

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-10-31 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-06-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010316

2001-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606231 20010125

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-12-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-08-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000127

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981118

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1997-06-11 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B08B 7/00

1997-06-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL