Global Patent Index - EP 0776733 B1

EP 0776733 B1 2002-09-25 - Surface conditioning articles and methods of making same

Title (en)

Surface conditioning articles and methods of making same

Title (de)

Schleiffolie zur Oberflächenkonditionierung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Feuille abrasive pour traitement de surface et procédé pour sa production

Publication

EP 0776733 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95402676 A

Priority

EP 95402676 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0776733A1] The present invention relates to a surface conditioning article comprising an organic matrix and water-based organic binders adhered to said matrix, said binders including a first binder and a second binder with abrasive particles dispersed and adhered within said second binder, wherein the first binder comprises a mixture of a phenolic resin and a carboxylated butadiene-acrylonitrile copolymer latex, in the range of weight ratio of dry materials of said latex versus said phenolic resin of 90/10 to 60/40.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 3/28; B24D 11/00; B24D 18/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 3/28 (2006.01); B24D 11/00 (2006.01); B24D 11/02 (2006.01); B24D 18/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 18/0027 (2013.01); B24D 3/28 (2013.01); B24D 11/001 (2013.01); B24D 11/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0776733 A1 19970604; EP 0776733 B1 20020925; DE 69528370 D1 20021031; DE 69528370 T2 20030605; WO 9719786 A1 19970605

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69528370

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141110

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081128

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071128

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081128

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69528370 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-04-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000314

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971030

1997-09-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT