Global Patent Index - EP 0776845 B1

EP 0776845 B1 2000-02-09 - Adjustable separating slot for paper sheets and the like

Title (en)

Adjustable separating slot for paper sheets and the like

Title (de)

Einstellbarer Vereinzelungsspalt für Papierbogen od.dgl

Title (fr)

Fente de séparation adjustable pour des feuilles en papier et similaire

Publication

EP 0776845 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96118493 A

Priority

DE 29519061 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: JPH09175680A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To guarantee the trouble-less operation of a gate device for individually extracting paper sheets from a paper feed pile one by one in the shortest possible time with a very simple action and accurately adjust the gap width of the passing nip of the feed gate device to the thickness of the machined paper or another material. SOLUTION: A brake roll 3 is rotatably supported on the eccentric ring 7 of an eccentric ring shaft 8 drivable and selectively adjustable in both rotating directions by the first electric motor driving device 40. The brake roll 3 can be driven at the revolving speed extremely higher than the adjusted speed of the brake roll 3 by the second electric motor driving device 26 via moving transmission members 15, 16 from the standard position when a friction roll 2 is stopped at the fixed position. When the transmission members 15, 16 reach the gap width to be adjusted, a switch element is operated, and both electric motor driving devices 26, 40 are stopped by the switching signal of the switch element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/192 (2006.01); B65H 3/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/5215 (2013.01); B65H 2511/13 (2013.01); B65H 2511/22 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/13 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2511/22 + B65H 2220/02 + B65H 2220/11

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29519061 U1 19960125; AT 189663 T 20000215; EP 0776845 A1 19970604; EP 0776845 B1 20000209; JP H09175680 A 19970708; US 5676365 A 19971014

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131119

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604411

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131119

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121119

2013-08-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130110

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111201

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101028

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-08-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040601

2003-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031119

2002-12-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20021218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021129

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-03-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Free text: M: THE FOLLOWING EUROPEAN PATENTS WERE ADVERTISED IN ERROR IN JOURNAL 5781 DATED 1 MARCH 2000 AS HAVING BEEN FILED UNDER SECTION 77(6)(A) ON 8 FEBRUARY 2000.

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604411 20000316

2000-03-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO EDER AG

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189663 T 20000215

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990428

1997-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970716

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL