Global Patent Index - EP 0776847 B1

EP 0776847 B1 2000-04-05 - Method for accelerating a continuous paper web on a cutting apparatus

Title (en)

Method for accelerating a continuous paper web on a cutting apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Beschleunigung einer Endlos-Papierbahn auf einem Schneidgerät

Title (fr)

Procédé pour accélérer une bande de papier continue dans un dispositif de coupe

Publication

EP 0776847 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118885 A

Priority

EP 95118885 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0776847A1] The acceleration device uses tractors (1) with transport pins (2) cooperating with edge perforations (4) spaced along both edges of the endless paper web (5). The device feeds the paper web to a sheet cutter with a pair of cooperating separation blades (11,12). The transport pins have a lesser diameter than the size of the edge perforations and are inserted in the latter via a pre-acceleration phase with a lower velocity before switching to the higher transport velocity upon compensation of all mechanical tolerances.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 20/22; B41J 11/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/26 (2006.01); B65H 20/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/22 (2013.01); B41J 11/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0776847 A1 19970604; EP 0776847 B1 20000405; DE 59508143 D1 20000511; ES 2144091 T3 20000601

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031213

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-12-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021201

2002-12-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021201

2002-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20011129

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-11-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20011128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-11-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-11-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011121

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-11-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20011119

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-11-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011116

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144091 T3

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508143 20000511

2000-04-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1999-09-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: A-TRONIC MGM AG

1999-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SUTER, WALTER

1998-09-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980724

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970826

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE