Global Patent Index - EP 0776961 B1

EP 0776961 B1 2001-02-28 - Process for the treatment of the exhaust gas form the gasification of carbonaceous material

Title (en)

Process for the treatment of the exhaust gas form the gasification of carbonaceous material

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Behandeln von Abgas aus der Vergasung von kohlenstoffhaltigem Material

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement des gaz de fumées provenant de la gazéification de matières carbonées

Publication

EP 0776961 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96116298 A

Priority

DE 19544200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0776961A1] This new process cleans gases from the partially-oxidative gasification of carbonaceous materials at 700-1100 degrees C. Solids entrained in the gases are separated by a cyclone. In the new process, a gas extraction line leaves high on the cyclone; solids leave via a low outlet channel. Through this channel in addition, a side stream, 5-30% of the gas, is led with the solids into an oxidation chamber. Here, at 1300-1800 degrees C, a lean oxygen supply produces either flue- or fuel gas, and slag. This gas, together with gas from the extraction line of the cyclone, is led into a mixing chamber. The mixture has a temperature of 900-1200 degrees C, and residence time at least of 0.5 seconds. Gases extracted from the mixing chamber are cooled.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10J 3/46; C10J 3/48; C10J 3/50; C10J 3/52; C10J 3/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/54 (2006.01); C10J 3/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/84 (2013.01); C10J 3/463 (2013.01); C10J 3/54 (2013.01); C10J 3/721 (2013.01); C10K 1/026 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1807 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1823 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1884 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0776961 A1 19970604; EP 0776961 B1 20010228; DE 19544200 A1 19970605

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606497

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131009

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-10-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051011

2002-08-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-06-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011011

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-06-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010515

2001-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-05-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MG TECHNOLOGIES AG

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606497 20010405

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000821

1999-01-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METALLGESELLSCHAFT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971204

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT