Global Patent Index - EP 0776966 B1

EP 0776966 B1 2002-09-11 - Liquid bleaching compositions packaged in spray-type dispenser and a process for pretreating fabrics therewith

Title (en)

Liquid bleaching compositions packaged in spray-type dispenser and a process for pretreating fabrics therewith

Title (de)

Flüssige Bleichmittelzusammensetzungen, verpackt in einem Sprühspender, und ein Verfahren zur Vorbehandlung von Geweben damit

Title (fr)

Compositions de blanchiment liquides, emballées dans un atomiseur, et procédé pour la prétraitement des tissus avec celles-ci

Publication

EP 0776966 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95203331 A

Priority

EP 95203331 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0776966A1] Liquid pretreater compositions packaged in a spray-type dispenser are described, said compositions comprising a peroxygen bleach, a surfactant and a bleach activator. A process of cleaning fabrics with a liquid composition comprising a peroxygen bleach and a surfactant, said process comprising the steps of dispensing said composition from a spray-type dispenser onto at least a portion of said fabrics, allowing said composition to remain in contact with said fabrics and then washing said fabrics, is said to reduce the loss of tensile strength and/or the color damage in said fabrics.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/04; C11D 3/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06L 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/04 (2006.01); C11D 17/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/041 (2013.01); C11D 3/391 (2013.01); C11D 3/3947 (2013.01); C11D 17/0021 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0752469 A1 19970108 - PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0776966 A1 19970604; EP 0776966 B1 20020911; AR 004831 A1 19990310; AT 223965 T 20020915; AU 1025097 A 19970627; AU 720040 B2 20000525; BR 9611860 A 19990504; CA 2239229 A1 19970612; CN 1207781 A 19990210; DE 69528179 D1 20021017; DE 69528179 T2 20030430; ES 2182864 T3 20030316; JP 3121841 B2 20010109; JP H11500778 A 19990119; MX 9804391 A 19980930; TR 199800994 T2 19980821; WO 9720980 A1 19970612; ZA 9610007 B 19970613

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-10-11 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-10-11 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20060629

2005-12-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051230

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-12-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051215

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-12-01 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051201

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051104

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-24 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-10-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-08-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER PLC

- Effective date: 20030609

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182864 T3

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-12-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-02 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021202

2002-12-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021202

2002-11-13 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020402976

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69528179 20021017

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223965 T 20020915

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000222

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971111

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE