Global Patent Index - EP 0776985 B1

EP 0776985 B1 2001-12-19 - Method for applying a metallic adhesion layers for ceramic insulating layer on metallic articles

Title (en)

Method for applying a metallic adhesion layers for ceramic insulating layer on metallic articles

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Aufbringung einer metallischen Haftschicht für keramische Wärmedämmschichten auf metallische Bauteile

Title (fr)

Procédé de disposition d'une couche métallique d'adhérence pour des couches isolantes sur articles métalliques

Publication

EP 0776985 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810768 A

Priority

DE 19545025 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0776985A1] A method of applying a metallic bonding layer for thermally sprayed ceramic heat insulating layers (6) on metallic components involves (a) applying a binder onto the degreased and oxide-free metallic surface of the substrate material (2); (b) applying metallic bonding powder (4) uniformly onto the binder; (c) applying solder powder (5), of smaller particle size than the bonding powder (4), uniformly onto the binder; and (d) drying the binder and heat treating to effect soldering. In an alternative method, an oxidation and corrosion resistant layer is produced on the cleaned metallic surface by gas-shielded plasma spraying prior to step (a), the bonding powder is a coarse powder having the same composition as this oxidation and corrosion resistant layer, step (c) is omitted and step (d) comprises drying the binder and then heat treating (solution annealing) to form a sintered bond between the metallic component and the oxidation and corrosion resistant layer and between the oxidation and corrosion resistant layer and the bonding powder. Also claimed are metallic bonding layers produced by the above methods.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 4/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 24/10 (2006.01); C23C 4/02 (2006.01); C23C 4/18 (2006.01); C23C 24/08 (2006.01); C23C 26/00 (2006.01); C23C 28/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 28/00 (2013.01); C23C 4/02 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12028 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12056 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12063 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12097 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0776985 A1 19970604; EP 0776985 B1 20011219; AT 211185 T 20020115; CA 2188614 A1 19970603; CA 2188614 C 20051004; CN 1160088 A 19970924; CN 1161489 C 20040811; CZ 290920 B6 20021113; CZ 9603468 A3 19970813; DE 19545025 A1 19970605; JP 3983323 B2 20070926; JP H09176818 A 19970708; PL 181404 B1 20010731; PL 182552 B1 20020131; PL 317298 A1 19970609; RU 2209256 C2 20030727; US 5894053 A 19990413

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111111

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 211185 T

- Effective date: 20111111

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111111

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111111

2012-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111111

2012-06-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALSTOM (SCHWEIZ) A.G.

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101112

2011-06-28 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20101116

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101118

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20011219

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20011219

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101109

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091106

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-18 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2002-07-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020311

2002-03-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: ALSTOM (SCHWEIZ) AG,HASELSTRASSE 16,5400 BADEN (CH) TRANSFER- ALSTOM (SCHWEIZ) AG,BROWN BOVERI STRASSE 7,5401 BADEN (CH)

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608498 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Free text: 20011219 *ALSTOM (SCHWEIZ) A.G.:BROWN BOVERI STRASSE 7, CH-5401 BADEN

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211185 T 20020115

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990201

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971106

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE