Global Patent Index - EP 0777001 B1

EP 0777001 B1 2000-03-22 - Lappet for spinning machines

Title (en)

Lappet for spinning machines

Title (de)

Fadenleitöse für Spinnereimaschinen

Title (fr)

Guide-fil pour métiers à filer

Publication

EP 0777001 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96119087 A

Priority

  • JP 1256995 U
  • JP 6134696 A
  • JP 6134496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0777001A1] A lappet has a fixed member (15; 29; 33) and a movable member (16; 30). The fixer member (15; 29; 33) is fixed to a support member (14; 28) for integral rotation. The support member (14; 28) extends parallel to a longitudinal direction of a rail (7) supporting a spindle (8) that carries a bobbin (B) on which a yarn (Y) is wound. The movable member (16; 30) has a guide (11) for guiding the yarn (Y) to the bobbin (B). The movable member (16; 30) is relatively rotatable to the fixed member (15; 29; 33) and integrally rotatable with the support member (14; 28) by way of the fixed member (15; 29; 33). The support member (14; 28) has a positioning surface (14a; 28a; 32a; 32b; 28b; 28c). The fixed member (15; 29; 33) has a fitting portion (17; 29c; 23) for mating with the support member (14; 28). The fitting portion (17; 29c; 23) has an engaging portion (17a; 29f; 23a; 29g; 29h; 33c) that engages the positioning surface (14a; 28a; 32a; 32b; 28b; 28c) to prevent a relative rotation of the fixed member (15; 29; 33) to the support member (14; 28). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/42 (2006.01); D01H 9/14 (2006.01); D01H 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/425 (2013.01); D01H 9/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0777001 A1 19970604; EP 0777001 B1 20000322; DE 69607301 D1 20000427; DE 69607301 T2 20000824; KR 100189305 B1 19990601

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101128

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69607301

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69607301

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091113

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL S.A.

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607301 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1997-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970704

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961128

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI