Global Patent Index - EP 0777007 B1

EP 0777007 B1 2001-05-09 - Sampling device for units for dyeing textile materials

Title (en)

Sampling device for units for dyeing textile materials

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Probeentnahme für Maschinen zum Färben von Textilien

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'échantillonnage pour machines à teindre des textiles

Publication

EP 0777007 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96118649 A

Priority

IT MI952495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0777007A1] A sampling device for units for dyeing textile materials, which has the particularity that it comprises a sampling chamber (2) affected by the circulation of at least one portion of a dyeing bath of a unit for dyeing textile materials. The chamber contains means (21) for moving a sample (20) of the textile material being processed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 23/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 23/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 23/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0777007 A1 19970604; EP 0777007 B1 20010509; DE 69612720 D1 20010613; DE 69612720 T2 20020207; IT 1279088 B1 19971204; IT MI952495 A1 19970529; IT MI952495 D0 19951129

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051120

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051120

2004-12-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041230

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-11-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041111

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612720 20010613

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-09 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010509

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990806

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971127

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB