Global patent index - EP 0777080 B1

EP 0777080 B1 2000-01-19 - Method for mounting a steam generating boiler

Title (en)

Method for mounting a steam generating boiler

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Montage eines Kessels zur Erzeugung von Dampf

Title (fr)

Procédé de montage d'une chaudière de production de vapeur

Publication

EP 0777080 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402503 A

Priority

FR 9514076 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0777080A1] The installation of a steam boiler involves using a carrying structure (1) in the form of a tower of a determined height (H). A ceiling (2), of a height (h) less than that of the tower, is fixed to the top of the tower and boiler parts (3) are suspended from it. The procedure involves assembling the ceiling on the ground on which the tower is erected. The ceiling is then raised progressively to a determined height (hn) and the boiler parts suspended some metres from the ground. That height is less than or equal to the height of the boiler parts and is attained in stages. If it is less than the height of the boiler parts, the structure is erected to a determined height (h(n+1)). The ceiling is raised to this height and the boiler parts successively suspended. These stages are repeated until it reaches a height equal to that of the ceiling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22B 37/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 37/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22B 37/244 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE ES GB GR PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0777080 A1 19970604; EP 0777080 B1 20000119; CN 1130518 C 20031210; CN 1159538 A 19970917; ES 2144220 T3 20000601; FR 2741701 A1 19970530; FR 2741701 B1 19971226; GR 3033106 T3 20000831; PT 777080 E 20000630; RU 2156918 C2 20000927; ZA 9609914 B 19970618

INPADOC legal status

2006-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20041122

2004-11-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041122

2004-07-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031121

2003-11-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031121

2003-11-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031120

- Year of fee payment: 08

2003-08-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES;SEARCHED & EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-06-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030609

2003-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *ALSTOM ENERGY SYSTEMS

- Effective date: 20021130

2003-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2002-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021030

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011114

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-10-25 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20011025

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-10-19 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20011019

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2144220

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000314

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE ES GB GR PT

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990507

1999-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM ENERGY SYSTEMS S.A.

1997-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971022

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE ES GB GR PT