Global Patent Index - EP 0777101 B1

EP 0777101 B1 2001-02-28 - Mechanical unlocking system together with aerodynamic breaking, for missile sectons

Title (en)

Mechanical unlocking system together with aerodynamic breaking, for missile sectons

Title (de)

Mechanische und aerodynamische Trennvorrichtung für mehrstufige Flugkörper

Title (fr)

Système de séparation de tronçons d'engin à déverrouillage mécanique et échappement aérodynamique

Publication

EP 0777101 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402543 A

Priority

FR 9514077 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0777101A1] The release mechanism consists of a hub (13) containing a series of radial micro-power cylinders (3). The hub is fixed to one section of the missile and is surrounded by a cylindrical shell (14) projecting from the end of the other section. The shell is pierced with radial holes (15) to receive fingers (7) which are directed outwards from the cylinders. The micro-power cylinders are surrounded by an annular chamber (4) which delivers pressure evenly to the cylinders, while a pyrotechnic unit (8) generates the pressure in the chamber which retracts the fingers and disengages the two sections of the missile.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 15/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 15/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 15/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0777101 A1 19970604; EP 0777101 B1 20010228; DE 69611889 D1 20010405; DE 69611889 T2 20010830; FR 2741710 A1 19970530; FR 2741710 B1 19980102

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051126

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-07-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-11-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021126

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011123

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011029

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20011022

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011019

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611889 20010405

2001-04-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990511

1999-04-21 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: TDA ARMEMENTS S.A.S.

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971114

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE