Global Patent Index - EP 0777152 B1

EP 0777152 B1 2001-03-14 - Silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material

Title (en)

Silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material

Title (de)

Farbphotographisches, lichtempfindliches Silberhalogenidmaterial

Title (fr)

Produit photographique couleur à l'halogénure d'argent sensible à la lumière

Publication

EP 0777152 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96118902 A

Priority

JP 33419295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0777152A1] A silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material is described, which comprises a support having thereon at least one photographic constituent layer, wherein any one of the photographic constituent layer contains at least one reducing agent for color formation represented by formula (I), at least one dye-forming coupler and at least one compound having a quenching velocity constant (Kq) to a singlet oxygen of 1x10<7> M<-1>.sec<-1> or more.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 7/392

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/08 (2006.01); G03C 1/42 (2006.01); G03C 1/74 (2006.01); G03C 7/00 (2006.01); G03C 7/392 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/39296 (2013.01); G03C 7/39224 (2013.01); G03C 7/39232 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0777152 A1 19970604; EP 0777152 B1 20010314; DE 69612061 D1 20010419; DE 69612061 T2 20010802; JP 3383499 B2 20030304; JP H09152693 A 19970610

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111126

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69612061

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111126

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101104

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-05-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612061 20010419

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-07-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980625

1998-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980625

1997-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970724

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB