Global Patent Index - EP 0777260 B1

EP 0777260 B1 2002-09-18 - Mass spectrometer

Title (en)

Mass spectrometer

Title (de)

Massenspektrometer

Title (fr)

Spectromètre de masse

Publication

EP 0777260 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96118920 A

Priority

JP 31382695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0777260A1] A sample separated through a pre-processor part 1 having a gas chromatography (GC) or liquid chromatography (LC) and a moving-bed eliminating part 2 is ionized by an ion source 3 and mass-analyzed by a mass-analyzing part 4. The mass-analyzed ions are deflected and focused by a deflecting portion A and a focusing portion B in a deflecting and focusing part 5, and detected by an ion detecting part 8. The result of detection is processed by a data processing part 11. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 49/02; H01J 49/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/62 (2006.01); H01J 49/02 (2006.01); H01J 49/06 (2006.01); H01J 49/22 (2006.01); H01J 49/42 (2006.01); G01N 30/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 49/025 (2013.01); G01N 30/72 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0777260 A1 19970604; EP 0777260 B1 20020918; DE 69623728 D1 20021024; DE 69623728 T2 20030522; JP 3189652 B2 20010716; JP H09161719 A 19970620; US 5756993 A 19980526

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69623728

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071115

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623728 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990528

1998-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971126

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR