Global Patent Index - EP 0777306 B1

EP 0777306 B1 2000-07-26 - Smooth contact terminals, method to manufacture such terminals and products comprising such terminals

Title (en)

Smooth contact terminals, method to manufacture such terminals and products comprising such terminals

Title (de)

Glatte Kontaktelemente, Verfahren zur Herstellung solcher Elemente und Produkte mit solchen Elementen

Title (fr)

Eléments de contact lisses, procédé de fabrication de tels éléments et produits ayant de tels éléments

Publication

EP 0777306 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95203317 A

Priority

EP 95203317 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0777306A1] Method of producing a contact terminal (1; 17; 18; 35; 36; 60) provided with at least a first contact surface (4; 25; 26; 64) for contacting e.g. a mating contact area (6; 18; 17) including at least the following step: a. stamping the contact terminal from a piece of blank having a substantially flat surface with a predetermined first width, said first contact surface (4; 25; 26; 64) being substantially perpendicular to said flat surface; b. pressing said first contact surface (4; 25; 26; 64) against a first, highly polished surface (27; 66) of a support tool (16), said first polished surface (27; 66) having a first predetermined shape; c. exerting a first predetermined force on said contact terminal in order to deform said first contact surface (4; 25; 26; 64) against said first, highly polished surface (27; 66) of said support tool (16), thus, polishing said first contact surface. The invention also relates to highly polished terminals and products provided with such terminals. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/04 (2006.01); H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 13/115 (2006.01); H01R 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/112 (2013.01); H01R 43/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0777306 A1 19970604; EP 0777306 B1 20000726; DE 69518157 D1 20000831; DE 69518157 T2 20010329; JP 2000501225 A 20000202; WO 9720369 A1 19970605

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-07-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031201

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-12-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-02-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021220

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-09-18 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20020426

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ITT MANUFACTURING ENTERPRISES, INC.

- Effective date: 20010426

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69518157 20000831

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990920

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971107

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB