Global Patent Index - EP 0777771 B1

EP 0777771 B1 2000-05-24 - CARDING MACHINE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING AN AERODYNAMIC CARD WEB

Title (en)

CARDING MACHINE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING AN AERODYNAMIC CARD WEB

Title (de)

KREMPEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES AERODYNAMISCH GEBILDETEN FASERFLORES

Title (fr)

CARDE ET PROCEDE POUR LA FABRICATION DE VOILES AERODYNAMIQUES DE CARDE

Publication

EP 0777771 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95929069 A

Priority

  • DE 4430500 A
  • EP 9503088 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4430500A1] A carding machine for producing an aerodynamic card web (4) has a fibre feeding device (6), a main cylinder (8) that rotates at a high speed of rotation and a shaft (10) arranged on the main cylinder (8) that guides the hurled fibres in an air flow (12) up to an air-permeable card web conveyor (14) and deposits them as a card web on the card web conveyor (14). The main cylinder (8) hurls the fibres at a first point (22) of the shaft (10) onto a second drum (20) that rotates at high speed in the direction opposite to the main cylinder (8), generating a layer of tangled fibres on said drum (20), and the second drum (20) hurls the fibres into the air flow (12) at a second point (24) of the shaft (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 25/00; D01G 15/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/46 (2006.01); D01G 23/08 (2006.01); D01G 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/465 (2013.01); D01G 25/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 4430500 A1 19960229; AT 193340 T 20000615; EP 0777771 A1 19970611; EP 0777771 B1 20000524; JP H10505638 A 19980602; US 5839166 A 19981124; WO 9606964 A1 19960307

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080803

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070821

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071005

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070828

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PORTA CHECCACCI & ASSOCIATI S.P.A.

2000-08-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508399 20000629

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2000-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193340 T 20000615

1998-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981012

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970215

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT