Global Patent Index - EP 0777777 B1

EP 0777777 B1 2000-11-22 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR DOSING A PASTE-LIKE WASHING AGENT AND CORRESPONDING SALES PACKAGE

Title (en)

PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR DOSING A PASTE-LIKE WASHING AGENT AND CORRESPONDING SALES PACKAGE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM DOSIEREN EINES PASTENARTIGEN WASCHMITTELS SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDES VERKAUFSGEBINDE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DOSAGE DE PRODUITS DE LAVAGE PATEUX ET EMBALLAGE DE VENTE CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 0777777 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95930479 A

Priority

  • DE 4430418 A
  • EP 9503266 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4430418C1] A sales package (10) or part of a sales package filled with washing agent is placed in a reservoir (1) of a dosing apparatus and opened at its bottom side. A volume-controlled pressure (5) is applied from above upon the washing product and the paste that comes out of the bottom side (8) of the package is washed out with water into the washing machine. Small packages may thus be economically and almost completely emptied and exact doses of paste (12) may be directly dispensed into the washing machine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/022 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GR IE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 4430418 C1 19951026; EP 0777777 A1 19970611; EP 0777777 B1 20001122; FI 970787 A0 19970225; FI 970787 A 19970225; GR 3035137 T3 20010430; WO 9606969 A1 19960307

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59508872

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140813

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-03-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59508872

- Representative's name: GODEMEYER BLUM LENZE PARTNERSCHAFT, PATENTANWA, DE

2014-03-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59508872

- Representative's name: GODEMEYER BLUM LENZE PATENTANWAELTE, PARTNERSC, DE

2003-05-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030305

2002-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020819

2001-11-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20010830

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-08-23 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20010823

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-08-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010815

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-04-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-01-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508872 20001228

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GR IE LI

2000-03-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE GR IE LI

1998-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980831

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970217

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GR IE LI