Global Patent Index - EP 0777783 B1

EP 0777783 B1 2000-03-01 - SOFT LAYERED TISSUES HAVING HIGH WET STRENGTH

Title (en)

SOFT LAYERED TISSUES HAVING HIGH WET STRENGTH

Title (de)

SANFTES MEHRLAGIGES TISSUE-PAPIER MIT HOHER NASSFESTIGKEIT

Title (fr)

TISSUS OUATES EN NAPPES PRESENTANT UNE RESISTANCE ELEVEE AU MOUILLE

Publication

EP 0777783 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95927342 A

Priority

  • US 9509232 W
  • US 29415394 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9606223A1] Tissues having a combination of softness and good wet strength are made by producing a multi-layered tissue in which debonding agents and wet strength agents are provided in separate layers. The wet strength agents are provided in the central layer(s) and the debonding agents are provided in the outer layer(s) of the tissue.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 11/14; D21F 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 10/16 (2006.01); D21F 11/04 (2006.01); D21F 11/14 (2006.01); D21H 27/00 (2006.01); D21H 27/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 11/145 (2013.01); D21F 11/04 (2013.01); D21F 11/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9606223 A1 19960229; AU 3139795 A 19960314; AU 683579 B2 19971113; BR 9508808 A 19970812; CA 2145554 A1 19960223; CA 2145554 C 20060509; CO 4440461 A1 19970507; DE 69515316 D1 20000406; DE 69515316 T2 20001130; EP 0777783 A1 19970611; EP 0777783 B1 20000301; JP 3793572 B2 20060705; JP H10504615 A 19980506; MX 9701144 A 19970531; PL 178164 B1 20000331; PL 319018 A1 19970721; TW 305901 B 19970521; ZA 9506979 B 19960328

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060706

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070714

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-08-21 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2007-06-06 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20061116

2007-06-06 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20061116

2006-08-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20001130

2006-08-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE

- Effective date: 20001130

2006-08-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB

- Effective date: 20001201

2006-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-07-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060705

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-06-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060614

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-11-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20001130

2004-11-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE

- Effective date: 20001130

2004-11-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB

- Effective date: 20001201

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE INC.

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-02-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2003-02-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: FORT JAMES FRANCE

2003-02-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB

2002-11-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY * 20001130 FORT JAMES

- Effective date: 20001130

2002-09-10 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020910

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-06-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020618

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2001-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: FORT JAMES FRANCE

2001-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB

2001-01-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-01-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FORT JAMES FRANCE

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-01-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB

- Effective date: 20001201

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515316 20000406

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-03-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-01-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1998-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981014

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970321

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE