Global Patent Index - EP 0777918 B1

EP 0777918 B1 2000-12-27 - MICROWAVE SIGNAL SWITCH

Title (en)

MICROWAVE SIGNAL SWITCH

Title (de)

SCHALTER FÜR HOCHFREQUENZSIGNALE

Title (fr)

COMMUTATEUR POUR SIGNAUX HYPERFREQUENCES

Publication

EP 0777918 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96910994 A

Priority

  • FR 9600471 W
  • FR 9503613 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9630961A1] A microwave signal switch with a metal housing containing an electrically conductive part and two electrically conductive pads each having a contact surface for contacting a facing surface on said part, said electrically conductive part being movable from a closed position in which it engages and electrically interconnects the contact surfaces of both pads, and an open position in which it is spaced apart from said contact surfaces. At least one of the contact surfaces (5) and/or the surface (9) of said electrically conductive part (3) are provided with projections (6) comprising, in a cross-sectional plane perpendicular to the contact surface, an acute-angled cross-section with a vertex angle ( THETA ) of less than 110 DEG and a radius of curvature of less than 0.05 mm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/12; H01H 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/06 (2006.01); H01P 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/06 (2013.01); H01P 1/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9630961 A1 19961003; CA 2191253 A1 19961003; DE 69611345 D1 20010201; DE 69611345 T2 20010719; EP 0777918 A1 19970611; EP 0777918 B1 20001227; FR 2732508 A1 19961004; FR 2732508 B1 19970509

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130328

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69611345

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130328

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-10-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611345 20010201

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991208

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970328

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE