Global Patent Index - EP 0777980 B1

EP 0777980 B1 2000-01-19 - Shoe with support of the lower leg

Title (en)

Shoe with support of the lower leg

Title (de)

Schuh mir Unterschenkelstütze

Title (fr)

Chaussure avec soutien de bas de jambe

Publication

EP 0777980 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96116917 A

Priority

FR 9515014 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0777980A1] The boot consists of a shell (1) which covers the foot, and a shank (12) which surrounds the lower leg and has a supporting panel (8) adjacent to its inlet edge with two zones (18,19) having different degrees of flexibility. The supporting panel is located inside a front opening flap of the boot shank, where it is held in place by fastenings (9) in the form of studs (10) and holes or slots (11) which allow it to be fitted either way up. The number of holes or slots is greater than the number of studs, allowing the panel to be fitted in different positions. Its zones of different flexibility can be made by cut-outs in one edge or by using different materials.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/0433 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0777980 A1 19970611; EP 0777980 B1 20000119; DE 69606269 D1 20000224; FR 2742026 A1 19970613; FR 2742026 B1 19980109; JP H09173102 A 19970708; US 5867924 A 19990209

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2005-10-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051022

2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001127

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001023

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001005

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-03-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DOTT. GIOVANNI LECCE & C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69606269

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-24

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990114

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970903

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI